EP1519503 - Portable radio telephone device and control method for same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Mobile Communications Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2013/09] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Fujitsu Toshiba Mobile Communications Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umemoto, Yuji 4-14-4 Shinmachi Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-0002 / JP | [2005/41] |
Former [2005/13] | 01 /
Umemoto, Yuji 2-13-11-502, Hinodai Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | Representative(s) | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2011/34] | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/13] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04028299.8 | 09.12.1997 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | JP19960328770 | 09.12.1996 Original published format: JP 32877096 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1519503 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1519503 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1519503 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B15/00, G10L21/02 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
G10L21/02 (EP,US);
G10L21/0208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/13] | Title | German: | Mobiltelephon und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2005/13] | English: | Portable radio telephone device and control method for same | [2005/13] | French: | Radio-téléphone mobile et procédé pour son contrôle | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 10.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97946824.6 / EP0921649 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970946824) is 10.05.2004 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5307405 (SIH GILBERT C [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 9, lines 52-64 *; | [AP]JPH09247246 (NIPPON ELECTRIC ENG) [AP] 1-10 * abstract *; | [L]FR2794322 (SAGEM [FR]) [L] 1-10* page 1, line 20 - page 2, line 5 *; | [I] - RAMAN V R ET AL, "Fast echo cancellation in a voice-processing system", SPEECH PROCESSING 1. SAN FRANCISCO, MAR. 23 - 26, 1992; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19920323), vol. 4, doi:10.1109/ICASSP.1992.226398, ISBN 978-0-7803-0532-8, pages 513 - 516, XP010059126 [I] 1-10 *Section 3* * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1992.226398 |