EP1526369 - Coverslip and method for applying a coverslip to a glass slide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/17] | Stackable non-stick coverslip | ||
[2006/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VENTANA MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 3865 North Business Center Driver Tucson, AZ 85705 / US | [2005/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crouch, Samuel W. 705 36th Street Boulder Colorado 80303 / US | 02 /
Reinhardt, Kurt 8901 E. Bluefield Street Tucson Arizona 85710 / US | 03 /
Richards, William L. 1885 W. Via Mandarina Tucson Arizona 85737 / US | [2005/17] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04028367.3 | 20.11.2000 | [2005/17] | Priority number, date | US19990166771P | 22.11.1999 Original published format: US 166771 P | US20000193797P | 31.03.2000 Original published format: US 193797 P | [2005/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1526369 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1526369 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28, G01N1/31 | [2005/17] | CPC: |
G01N1/312 (EP);
G02B21/34 (EP);
G01N2035/00079 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/17] | Title | German: | Deckglas sowie Verfahren zu seiner Aufbringung auf einen Objektträger | [2006/03] | English: | Coverslip and method for applying a coverslip to a glass slide | [2006/03] | French: | Couvre-objet et procédé de recouvrement d'une lamelle de verre | [2006/03] |
Former [2005/17] | Stapelbares nichthaftendes Deckglas | ||
Former [2005/17] | Stackable non-stick coverslip | ||
Former [2005/17] | Couvre-objet empilable non collant | Examination procedure | 25.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 11.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00980564.9 / EP1242800 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4146414 (STORMBY NILS G) [A] 1-9* column 1, line 46 - column 1, line 65; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5661029 (SELF JIM [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 36 - column 2, line 41 *; | [A]US5939251 (HU MIN [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 19 - column 2, line 31 * * column 5, line 3 - column 5, line 52; figures 3-5 * |