EP1666679 - Connection of angularly positioned window, door, roof or façades Profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/23] | Connector for angularly positioned profiles, in particular for windows, doors, roofs, facades and the like | ||
[2007/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EDUARD HUECK GmbH & CO. KG Loher Strasse 9 58511 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfeiffer, Jürgen Steinrücken 17 58802 Balve / DE | 02 /
Wagner, Horst Auf der Burg 32 57462 Olpe / DE | 03 /
Wesnigk, Ralph Winkeln 4 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | [2006/23] | Application number, filing date | 04028393.9 | 01.12.2004 | [2006/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1666679 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1666679 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E04D3/08 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
E06B3/9642 (EP);
E04B2/965 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2007/07] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stossverbindung von winkelig aneinander anschliessbaren Fenster-, Türen-,Fassaden-, oder Dachprofilen | [2007/01] | English: | Connection of angularly positioned window, door, roof or façades Profiles | [2007/01] | French: | Connection de profilés de fenêtre, porte ou toiture se rencontrant angulairement | [2007/01] |
Former [2006/23] | Stossverbinder für winkelig aneinander anschliessbare Profile, insbesondere für Fenster, Türen, Fassaden, Dächer u. dgl. | ||
Former [2006/23] | Connector for angularly positioned profiles, in particular for windows, doors, roofs, facades and the like | ||
Former [2006/23] | Connecteur pour des profilés se rencontrant angulairement, notamment pour des fenêtres, façades, toitures et similaire | Examination procedure | 01.12.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Drawings | 21.02.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Drawings {1} | 13.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 14.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2848258 (PERCIVAL MUDD DEREK) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [X]DE3603717 (KREUSEL ULRICH) [X] 1 * figures 2,12 *; | [A]US5480251 (PAVAGEAU FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [A] 1* figures 6,9 *; | [X]EP1258577 (KEE KLAMP LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * figure - * |