EP1515047 - Compressor capacity modulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Revocation of patent | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMERSON CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 1675 W. Campbell Road Sidney, OH 45365-0669 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2005/11] | For all designated states COPELAND CORPORATION 1675 W Campbell Road Sidney Ohio 45365-0669 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caillat, Jean Luc 7001 Settlement Way Dayton Ohio 45414 / US | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04028437.4 | 29.07.1999 | [2005/11] | Priority number, date | US19980139865 | 25.08.1998 Original published format: US 139865 | [2005/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1515047 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1515047 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1515047 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/06, F04C28/24 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
F04C28/24 (EP,US);
F25B49/00 (KR);
A47F3/04 (EP,US);
F04B49/06 (EP,US);
F04B49/22 (EP,US);
F04B49/225 (EP,US);
F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C27/005 (EP,US);
F04C28/00 (EP,US);
F04C28/02 (EP,US);
F04C28/06 (EP,US);
F04C28/08 (EP,US);
F04C28/22 (EP,US);
F04C28/265 (EP,US);
F04C28/28 (EP,US);
F25B1/04 (EP,US);
F25B41/22 (EP,KR,US);
F25B41/35 (EP,US);
F25B49/005 (EP,US);
F25B49/022 (EP,US);
F25B5/02 (EP,US);
G05D23/1909 (EP,US);
F04B2201/0601 (EP,US);
F04B2205/16 (EP,US);
F04B2207/043 (EP,US);
F04C2270/015 (EP,US);
F04C2270/58 (EP,US);
F04C2270/86 (EP,US);
F04C23/008 (EP,US);
F25B2400/22 (EP,US);
F25B2600/0261 (EP,US);
F25B2600/2521 (EP,US);
F25B2700/193 (EP,US);
F25B2700/1933 (EP,US);
F25B2700/2106 (EP,US);
F25B2700/2117 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/11] | F04C29/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/11] | Title | German: | Liefermengenregelung eines Verdichters | [2005/11] | English: | Compressor capacity modulation | [2005/11] | French: | Compresseur à capacité modulée | [2005/11] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 30.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99306052.4 / EP0982497 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.01.2012
Bitzer Kühlmaschinenbau GmbH Eschenbrünnlestrasse 15 71065 Sindelfingen / DE Opponent's representative Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.01.2012
Bitzer Kühlmaschinenbau GmbH Eschenbrünnlestrasse 15 71065 Sindelfingen / DE Opponent's representative Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | 24.02.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.08.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.07.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.02.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/15] | Appeal following opposition | 09.10.2014 | Appeal received No. T2042/14 | 10.12.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.02.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 15.04.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08284842 ; | [X]JPS59145392 ; | [XY]DE764179 (KLEIN) [X] 1-8,10,11 * page 3, line 105 - page 5, line 72; figure 1 * * page 6, line 93 - page 7, line 24; figure 3 * [Y] 9,12,13; | [X]US3653783 (SAUDER EARL R) [X] 1-8,10,11,14-16 * column 1, line 6 - line 53 * * column 1, line 65 - column 4, line 9; figure - *; | [A]US4361417 (SUZUKI TOSHITSUGU) [A] 1 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 63; figure - *; | [A]GB2116635 (TRANE CO) [A] 1-4,7-10 * page 1, line 5 - line 8 * * page 1, line 56 - line 79 * * page 2, line 91 - page 3, line 94; figures 1-3 * * page 4, line 42 - line 92; figure 8 *; | [Y]DE3422398 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12,13 * page 13, line 11 - page 22, line 21; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]US4715792 (NISHIZAWA KAZUTOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 9 * column 3, line 28 - line 68; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 54 - line 66 * * column 5, line 37 - line 54; figure 9 * * column 7, line 8 - line 15 *; | [A]EP0482592 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 25 ** page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 17; figure - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 2, & JP08284842 A 19961029 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841214), vol. 8, no. 274, Database accession no. (M - 345)<1711>, & JP59145392 A 19840820 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO) [X] 1,11,12 * abstract * | by applicant | DE764179 | US3653783 | US4361417 | GB2116653 | JPS59145392 | JPH08284842 |