EP1537968 - Method and system for glueing fibres, and fibre glueing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dieffenbacher GmbH Maschinen- und Anlagenbau Heilbronner Strasse 20 75031 Eppingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | For all designated states Dieffenbacher GmbH Maschinen- und Anlagenbau Heilbronner Strasse 20 75031 Eppingen / DE | ||
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Dieffenbacher GmbH + Co. KG Heilbronnerstrasse 20 75031 Eppingen / DE | ||
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Dieffenbacher GmbH & Co. KG Heilbronnerstrasse 20 75031 Eppingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Haas, Gernot, Dr. Im Schussgarten 3 69181 Leimen / DE | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Hartdegen, Anton Angerfeldstrasse 12 82205 Gilching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Hartdegen, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Angerfeldstrasse 12 82205 Gilching / DE | Application number, filing date | 04028589.2 | 02.12.2004 | [2005/23] | Priority number, date | DE2003156775 | 02.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10356775 | [2005/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1537968 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1537968 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | [2005/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1537968 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B27N1/02 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
B27N3/14 (EP);
B27N1/0263 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlagen zur Beleimung von Fasern und eine Faserbeleimungsvorrichtung | [2005/23] | English: | Method and system for glueing fibres, and fibre glueing apparatus | [2005/23] | French: | Procédé et installation pour encoller des fibres, et dispositif d'encollage de fibres | [2005/23] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 18.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.06.2011 | DK | 08.06.2011 | EE | 08.06.2011 | FI | 08.06.2011 | HU | 08.06.2011 | IE | 08.06.2011 | LT | 08.06.2011 | NL | 08.06.2011 | PL | 08.06.2011 | RO | 08.06.2011 | SE | 08.06.2011 | TR | 08.06.2011 | BG | 08.09.2011 | GR | 09.09.2011 | ES | 19.09.2011 | IS | 08.10.2011 | PT | 10.10.2011 | LU | 02.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
LU | 02.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
LU | 02.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
LU | 02.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 08.06.2011 | |
SE | 08.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DD78881 (DRECHSLER ET AL.); | [DA]DE1653223 (HIMMELHEBER DIPL ING MAX, et al); | [X]GB1251753 (CONWED CORP.) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [DXA]US3622077 (WIEGAND DONALD E) [DX] 1,2,16 * abstract * * column 4, line 61 - line 65 * * figure 1 * [A] 10,22,28,29; | [DA]DE19740676 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [DA]US6197236 (OLDEMEYER WILHELM [DE], et al); | [A]DE10018218 (DIEFFENBACHER SCHENCK PANEL [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE10020881 (DIEFFENBACHER SCHENCK PANEL [DE]) [A] 1-29 * figures 1,6 *; | [A]NL1017528C (OLDENHUIS EXP [NL]) [A] 3-5 * page 2, line 16 - line 24 *; | [PX]WO03106127 (FLAKEBOARD COMPANY LTD [CA], et al) [PX] 18 * page 18, line 8 - line 19; figure 2 * | by applicant | DE1653223 | DE19740676 |