EP1541800 - Fixing element for guide rails for a sunshade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAREMA Renkhoff GmbH Vorderbergstrasse 30 D-97828 Marktheidenfeld / DE | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Troff, Hinrich St.-Michael-Strasse 4 97292 Holzkirchen / DE | 02 /
Kaufmann, Dietmar Kreustrasse 44 97837 Tiefenthal / DE | 03 /
Ruckstetter, Günter Hauptstrasse 129 97851 Rothenfels / DE | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Erb, Henning, et al Heinrich - Erb - Partner Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Hanauer Landstrasse 126-128 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Erb, Henning, et al Patentanwälte Beyer & Jochem Postfach 18 02 04 60083 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 04028771.6 | 03.12.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | DE2003157589 | 08.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10357589 | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1541800 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/58 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
E06B9/58 (EP);
E06B2009/587 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/10] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Befestigungselement für Führungsschienen von Sonnenschutzanlagen | [2005/24] | English: | Fixing element for guide rails for a sunshade | [2005/24] | French: | Dispositif de fixation de rail de guidage pour un arrangement pare-soleil | [2005/24] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.01.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.01.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH561351 (HUEPPE JUSTIN FA) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3617198 (WAREMA RENKHOFF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4799819 (SWOBODA HELLMUTH [CH]) [A] 3-5* column 24, line 48 - column 26, line 56; figures 11-14 *; | [A]FR2696510 (INTEXALU SA [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 * |