Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] |
04.04.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.01.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] |
17.01.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.01.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.04.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |