EP1574566 - A microbial process for arginine production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE FOR DNA FINGERPRINTING AND DIAGNOSTICS Ministry of Science & Technology Nacharam Hyderabad - 500 076 / IN | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jayaraman, Gowrishankar Centre for DNA Fingerprinting and Diagn., Nacharam Hyderabad 570 076 / IN | 02 /
Madhusudan, Reddy Nandineni Centre for DNA Fingerprinting and Diagn., Nacharam Hyderabad 570 076 / IN | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/37] | Goddar, Heinz J. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04028881.3 | 06.12.2004 | [2005/37] | Priority number, date | IN2004CHE0209 | 10.03.2004 Original published format: IN CH02092004 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574566 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574566 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, C12N15/70, C12N15/31, C07K14/245, C12P13/10, C12R1/19 | [2010/13] | CPC: |
C12P13/10 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
C12R2001/19 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/37] | C12N1/21, C12N15/70, C12N15/31, C07K14/245, C12P13/10, // (C12P13/10, C12R1:19) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | Mikrobielles Verfahren zur Herstellung von Arginin | [2005/37] | English: | A microbial process for arginine production | [2005/37] | French: | Procédé microbien de production d'arginine | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 26.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   16.02.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | BE | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | LT | 15.09.2010 | PL | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SE | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | ES | 26.12.2010 | IS | 15.01.2011 | PT | 17.01.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
LT | 15.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]EP1016710 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [DX] 12,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 1-11,13; | [XA]US2003113899 (YAMAGUCHI MIKIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,10-12,14,15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0029] , [0082] * * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0109]; examples 4,6; claims 1-15 * [A] 5-9,13; | [PX] - NANDINENI MADHUSUDAN R ET AL, "Evidence for an arginine exporter encoded by yggA (argO) that is regulated by the LysR-type transcriptional regulator ArgP in Escherichia coli", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (200406), vol. 186, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 3539 - 3546, XP002330430 [PX] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.186.11.3539-3546.2004 | [DX] - CELIS R T F, "Repression and activation of arginine transport genes in Escherichia coli K 12 by the ArgP protein", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (19991217), vol. 294, no. 5, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 1087 - 1095, XP004461787 [DX] 12-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1999.3308 | [A] - ALESHIN VLADIMIR V ET AL, "A new family of amino-acid-efflux proteins", TRENDS IN BIOCHEMICAL SCIENCES, (199904), vol. 24, no. 4, ISSN 0968-0004, pages 133 - 135, XP002330431 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0004(99)01367-5 | [DA] - GLANSDORFF N (NEIDHARDT ET AL, EDS), Escherichia coli and Salmonella: Cellular and Molecular Biology, 2nd edition - chapter 25: Biosynthesis of arginine and polyamines, WASHINGTON D.C., USA, ASM PRESS, (1996), ISBN 1-55581-084-5, XP002330432 [DA] 1-15 * page 408 - page 433 * |