EP1542109 - Driving control device for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2 Nishi Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2 Nishi Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2 Nishi Shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiwatashi, Yutaka Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 1-7-2 Nishishinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takazawa, Atsuyoshi Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 1-7-2 Nishishinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04028945.6 | 07.12.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | JP20030409529 | 08.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003409529 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1542109 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1542109 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, G01C21/30 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G05D1/0225 (EP,US);
G01C21/26 (EP,US);
G05D1/0278 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/10] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuerungsvorrichtung zur Führung eines Fahrzeuges | [2005/24] | English: | Driving control device for a vehicle | [2005/24] | French: | Dispositif de commande de conduite pour un vehicule | [2005/24] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 16.12.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.01.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.01.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5677837 (REYNOLDS JAMES C [US]) [A] 2 * abstract ** column 3, line 31 - line 35 *; | [Y]WO0137059 (BAIL GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 2 *; | [Y]US2001056326 (KIMURA KEIICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0087] , [0088] *; | [Y]US2002161517 (YANO KENICHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0095] - [0097] * * paragraphs [0102] - [0123] * * paragraphs [0137] - [0148] * |