EP1564241 - Pneumatic tyre having base tread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/33] | Rubber composition for base tread and pneumatic tire | ||
[2009/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2010/09] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hochi, Kazuo, c/o Sumitomo Rubber Ind., Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / US | [2005/33] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04029251.8 | 09.12.2004 | [2005/33] | Priority number, date | JP20040039835 | 17.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004039835 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1564241 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1564241 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/34, C08K3/36 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
B60C11/005 (EP,US);
C08K3/346 (EP,US);
C08K2201/016 (EP,US);
Y10S152/905 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/346, C08L21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/19] |
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reifen mit einer Basisschicht in der Lauffläche | [2009/40] | English: | Pneumatic tyre having base tread | [2009/40] | French: | Pneu avec une couche de base de la bande de roulement | [2009/40] |
Former [2005/33] | Kautschukmischung für die Basisschicht in der Lauffläche und Reifen | ||
Former [2005/33] | Rubber composition for base tread and pneumatic tire | ||
Former [2005/33] | Composition de caoutchouc pour couche de base de la bande de roulement et pneu | Examination procedure | 11.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 18.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2004027003 ; | [Y]JP2000016028 ; | [DX]JP2002088208 (BRIDGESTONE CORP)[DX] 1,2; | [XY]EP1195402 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 1-4 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2004027003 A 20040129 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] - [0025] - [0027] * [Y] 1-4 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000016028 A 20000118 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND LTD) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * |