EP1542248 - An electrolytic solution for an electrochemical capacitor and an electrochemical capacitor using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Chemical Industries, Ltd. 11-1, Ikkyo Nomoto-cho, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Sanyo Chemical Industries, Ltd. 11-1, Ikkyo Nomoto-cho, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | ||
For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states SANYO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 11-1, Ikkyo Nomoto-cho, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | ||
For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states SANYO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 11-1, Ikkyo Nomoto-cho, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | ||
For all designated states Matsuhita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujioka, Koji Sanyo Chemical Ind.,Ltd. 11-1, Ikkyo Nomoto-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | 02 /
Mukai, Takao Sanyo Chemical Ind.,Ltd. 11-1, Ikkyo Nomoto-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Yasuyuki Matsushita Electronic Components Co., Ltd. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | 04 /
Maeshima, Hiroyuki Matsushita Electronic Components Co., Ltd. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2012/19] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
Fujioka, Koji Sanyo Chemical Ind.,Ltd. 11-1, Ikkyo Nomoto-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | ||
02 /
Mukai, Takao Sanyo Chemical Ind.,Ltd. 11-1, Ikkyo Nomoto-cho Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | |||
03 /
Ito, Yasuyuki Matsushita Electronic Components Co., Ltd. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
04 /
Maeshima, Hiroyuki Matsushita Electronic Components Co., Ltd. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Morf, Jan Stefan, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Morf, Jan Stefan, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | Morf, Jan Stefan, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Abitz & Partner, Poschingerstrasse 6 81679 München (Bogenhausen) / DE | Application number, filing date | 04029267.4 | 10.12.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | JP20030411396 | 10.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003411396 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1542248 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1542248 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1542248 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/035 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
H01G11/62 (EP,US);
H01G9/02 (KR);
H01G9/035 (US);
Y02E60/13 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/13] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrolytlösung für einen elektrochemischen Kondensator und ein elektrochemischer Kondensator, der diese verwendet | [2005/24] | English: | An electrolytic solution for an electrochemical capacitor and an electrochemical capacitor using the same | [2005/24] | French: | Solution électrolytique pour un condensateur électrochimique et un condensateur électrochimique l'utilisant | [2005/24] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 17.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001230159 ; | [A]JP2003324039 ; | [DA]WO9515572 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al)[DA] 1-4,8-11; | [A]EP0684620 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,8-11 * page 3, line 53 - page 4, line 27 * * page 5, lines 1-24 *; | [X]US5965054 (MCEWEN ALAN B [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * figure 1; claim - *; | [X]US2002110739 (MCEWEN ALAN B [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * paragraphs [0052] - [0054] - [0061]; figure 3 *; | [X]US6535373 (SMITH W NOVIS [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 2; claim - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 74, Database accession no. 2001-642150, XP002482865 & JP2001230159 A 20010824 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1-11 * column A * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 13, Database accession no. 2004-126276, XP002482866 & JP2003324039 A 20031114 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK; SANYO CHEM IND LTD) [A] 1-11 * column A * |