EP1569088 - Apparatus and method for controlling operation of low frequency sound output means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Kyu Ho 1053ho, 107dong, Eunhasoo-Chungu Apt. Buhueng-dong Dong An-Gu, Anyang-shi, Kyoungki-do / KR | 02 /
Park, Jun Hyung A-202 Samdeokjinju APT 969-3 Hogye 3-dong Anyang-si Kyunggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Yang Ki A-301 Iretwinville 448-6, Bulgwang-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul / KR | [2005/52] |
Former [2005/38] | 01 /
Lee, Kyu Ho 9-10 ho, Joongang-dong, Gwachun-si Kyoung Ki-do / KR | ||
02 /
Park, Jun Hyung A-202 Samdeokjinju APT 969-3 Hogye 3-dong Anyang-si Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Yang Ki A-301 Iretwinville 448-6, Bulgwang-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul / KR | |||
Former [2005/35] | 01 /
Lee, Kyu Ho 9-10 Jungang-dong Kwacheon-si Kyunggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Park, Jun Hyung A-202 Samdeokjinju APT 969-3 Hogye 3-dong Anyang-si Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Yang Ki A-301 Iretwinville 448-6, Bulgwang-dong Eunpyeong-gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04029355.7 | 10.12.2004 | [2005/35] | Priority number, date | KR20040013273 | 27.02.2004 Original published format: KR 2004013273 | KR20040019715 | 23.03.2004 Original published format: KR 2004019715 | [2005/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1569088 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1569088 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/16 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
H04R5/04 (EP,US);
G06F3/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung von Tieftonausgabemitteln | [2005/35] | English: | Apparatus and method for controlling operation of low frequency sound output means | [2005/35] | French: | Appareil et procédé de contrôle d'un dispositif de sortie audio à basse fréquence | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 10.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/27] | 08.02.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/27] | 15.02.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS63269633 (MAZDA MOTOR) [Y] 6,12,17,22 * abstract *; | [A]US5910991 (FARRAR DOUGLAS M [US]) [A] 1-24* abstract *; | [XY]US2001020193 (TERAMACHI KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,13-16,18-21,23,24 * figures 1,3-5,7 * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0133] * * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0144] * * paragraph [0147] - paragraph [0150] * * paragraph [0153] - paragraph [0155] * [Y] 6,12,17,22; | [A]JP2002078072 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-24 * abstract * |