EP1548293 - An integrated unit for air treatment in pneumatic systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METAL WORK S.p.A. Via Segni, 5-7-9 I-25062 Concesio (BS) / IT | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lucidera, Marco Via Salvo D'Acquisto 9 25050 Rodengo Saiano BS / IT | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Faraggiana, Vittorio, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Faraggiana, Vittorio, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/26] | Faraggiana, Vittorio, Dr. Ing. Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04029428.2 | 13.12.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | IT2003MI02563 | 22.12.2003 Original published format: IT MI20032563 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1548293 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1548293 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1548293 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F15B21/04 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
F15B21/048 (EP,US);
F15B11/068 (EP,US);
F15B21/041 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50554 (EP,US);
F15B2211/5158 (EP,US);
F15B2211/611 (EP,US);
F15B2211/615 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6355 (EP,US);
Y10S55/17 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/26] | F15B21/04, F15B11/068, F15B13/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | Intergrierte Einheit zur Behandlung der Luft bei pneumatischen Systemen | [2005/26] | English: | An integrated unit for air treatment in pneumatic systems | [2005/26] | French: | Une unité integrée pour le traitement de l'air des systèmes pneumatiques | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 17.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.03.2009 | 10.02.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.08.2009 | CZ | 05.08.2009 | EE | 05.08.2009 | LT | 05.08.2009 | PL | 05.08.2009 | SK | 05.08.2009 | TR | 05.08.2009 | BG | 05.11.2009 | IS | 05.12.2009 | LU | 13.12.2009 | HU | 06.02.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 05.08.2009 | |
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
LU | 13.12.2009 | ||
HU | 06.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 05.08.2009 | |
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
LU | 13.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 05.08.2009 | |
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SK | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CZ | 05.08.2009 | |
EE | 05.08.2009 | ||
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 05.08.2009 | |
LT | 05.08.2009 | ||
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | LT | 05.08.2009 | |
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
BG | 05.11.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | LT | 05.08.2009 | |
PL | 05.08.2009 | ||
IS | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | LT | 05.08.2009 | |
IS | 05.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [AY]US3572469 (MILLER JOHN F, et al) [A] 1,7 * column 1, lines 44-61; figure 1 * [Y] 12; | [AY]US4316801 (COOPER ROYDON B) [A] 1,6,9,11 * column 6, lines 3-50; figure 2 * [Y] 10; | [AY]US4487618 (MANN DAVID O [US]) [A] 1,7,12 * column 2, lines 2-9 * * column 3, lines 22-30; figure 2 * [Y] 14; | [AY]DE3909402 (SCHUMACHER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,6,7,12 * column 2, lines 19-28; figure 2 * [Y] 9,13; | [A]US5669422 (TARUSAWA TETSUNOBU [JP]) [A] 1,15-21* column 1, line 51 - column 3, line 4; figures 9,10 *; | [YA]US6169338 (STOLL KURT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-10,12-14,22,23 * column 4, lines 26-34 * * column 5, lines 6-11 * * column 6, lines 17-23; figure 1 * [A] 15-21; | [AY]EP1079120 (IMI NORGREN LTD [GB]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document * [Y] 4,6-10,12-14; | [Y]US6354329 (KUETHER LUDWIG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-10,12-14,22,23 * column 1, lines 33-36 * * column 4, line 2 - column 5, line 14; figures 1-4 *; | [AY]US2003136452 (OKITSU MASAYUKI [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0066]; figures 8a,8b * [Y] 3 |