Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
27.07.2007 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
19.04.2007 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | |
17.04.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
17.04.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
05.01.2007 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.01.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.11.2006 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
25.10.2006 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
18.10.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.10.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
26.08.2006 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.04.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
17.03.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] |
20.01.2006 | Publication of search report | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] |
27.05.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] |