EP1672125 - Apparatus and method for producing a foundation element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUER Maschinen GmbH Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerressen, Franz-Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Karlsbaderstrasse 21 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | 02 /
Hofner, Georg Hollerschlag 3 86567 Hilgertshausen / DE | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Wunderlich, Rainer, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | Wunderlich, Rainer, et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04029612.1 | 14.12.2004 | [2006/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1672125 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1672125 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E02D5/36 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
E02D7/22 (EP);
E02D5/36 (EP);
E02D7/24 (EP);
E02D7/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Title | German: | Tiefbauvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Gründungselements | [2006/25] | English: | Apparatus and method for producing a foundation element | [2006/25] | French: | Dispositif et procedée de produire une structure de fondation | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.06.2008 | CZ | 18.06.2008 | DK | 18.06.2008 | EE | 18.06.2008 | FI | 18.06.2008 | IE | 18.06.2008 | LT | 18.06.2008 | NL | 18.06.2008 | PL | 18.06.2008 | RO | 18.06.2008 | SI | 18.06.2008 | SK | 18.06.2008 | TR | 18.06.2008 | BG | 18.09.2008 | GR | 19.09.2008 | IS | 18.10.2008 | PT | 18.11.2008 | AT | 14.12.2008 | GB | 14.12.2008 | LU | 14.12.2008 | HU | 19.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 18.06.2008 | |
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
TR | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
AT | 14.12.2008 | ||
GB | 14.12.2008 | ||
LU | 14.12.2008 | ||
HU | 19.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 18.06.2008 | |
CZ | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
AT | 14.12.2008 | ||
GB | 14.12.2008 | ||
LU | 14.12.2008 | ||
HU | 19.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
AT | 14.12.2008 | ||
GB | 14.12.2008 | ||
LU | 14.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
AT | 14.12.2008 | ||
GB | 14.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
GB | 14.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IE | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
BG | 18.09.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
EE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
RO | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
SK | 18.06.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
LT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IS | 18.10.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 18.06.2008 | |
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 18.06.2008 | |
PL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SI | 18.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 18.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01312193 ; | [DA]DE7517180U (STADE, HEINRICH, 2240 HEIDE) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0732452 (COPLAN ING GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0989241 (HARENINVEST [BE]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * column 3, line 49 - column 3, line 58 * * column 6, line 20 - column 6, line 25; figure 1 *; | [DA]DE10219862 (BAUER SPEZIALTIEFBAU [DE]) [DA] 1-10* the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900228), vol. 014, no. 110, Database accession no. (M - 0943), & JP01312193 A 19891215 (SHIOMIGUMI:KK; others: 01) [X] 1-3,7 * abstract * |