Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7202874 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2007 | B2 | US2005151732 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003418635 | 16.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3889394B | Global Dossier | 07.03.2007 | B2 | JP2005182207 | 07.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003418635 | 16.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1544799 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2010 | B1 | EP1544799 | 18.11.2009 | A3 | EP1544799 | 22.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003418635 | 16.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004030413D1 | 20.01.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003418635 | 16.12.2003 |