Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7061781 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2006 | B2 | US2005152163 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001618 | 09.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101220244B | Global Dossier | 09.01.2013 | B1 | KR20050073416 | 13.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004001618 | 09.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1553810 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2007 | B1 | EP1553810 | 08.02.2006 | A3 | EP1553810 | 13.07.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001618 | 09.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE352974T | 15.02.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001618 | 09.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2491773 | 09.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001618 | 09.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100594754C | 17.03.2010 | C | CN1638595 | 13.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004001618 | 09.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004001618 | 11.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001618 | 09.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502004002763D1 | 15.03.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001618 | 09.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200531598 | 16.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004001618 | 09.01.2004 |