EP1584404 - Transformer housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Rexroth AG Heidehofstrasse 31 70184 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zlatolas, Marjan Gradisce 180 A 1291 Skoflsica / SI | 02 /
Lisjak, Rado Sisenska Cesta 2 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 03 /
Solar, Anton Log 47 4228 Zelezniki / SI | 04 /
Markelj, Circil Selca 154 4227 Selca / SI | [2005/41] | Application number, filing date | 04029935.6 | 17.12.2004 | [2005/41] | Priority number, date | DE20041017254 | 05.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004017254 | [2005/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1584404 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1584404 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/36 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
B23K11/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/41] | Title | German: | Transformatorgehäuse | [2005/41] | English: | Transformer housing | [2005/41] | French: | Boîtier pour un transformateur | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.01.2008 | CZ | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | EE | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | IE | 23.01.2008 | LT | 23.01.2008 | NL | 23.01.2008 | PL | 23.01.2008 | RO | 23.01.2008 | SI | 23.01.2008 | SK | 23.01.2008 | TR | 23.01.2008 | BG | 23.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | IS | 23.05.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | HU | 24.07.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
TR | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
HU | 24.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
LT | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
RO | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
PL | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
IS | 23.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
IS | 23.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0130276 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1* page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 24; figures 1-7; claim 1 *; | [A]WO03087685 (ATELIER SYSTEMES DE PROT SARL [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 12 - page 4, line 33; figures 1-2b; claim 1 * |