EP1586986 - Storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujimoto, Kazuhisa Hitachi, Ltd. 12th Fl.,Marunouchi Cent.Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hosoya, Mutsumi Hitachi, Ltd. 12th Fl.,Marunouchi Cent.Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Naoki Hitachi, Ltd. 12th Fl.,Marunouchi Cent.Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Shimada, Kentaro Hitachi, Ltd. 12th Fl.,Marunouchi Cent.Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/42] | Beetz & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04030004.8 | 17.12.2004 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | JP20040118986 | 14.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004118986 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1586986 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1586986 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
G06F12/0866 (EP,US);
G06F12/0813 (EP,US);
G06F3/0607 (EP,US);
G06F3/061 (EP,US);
G06F3/0635 (EP,US);
G06F3/0661 (EP,US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/28] |
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Speichersystem | [2005/42] | English: | Storage system | [2005/42] | French: | Système de stockage | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 30.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 04.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1274015 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,6,9,12,14-16 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0024] *; | [XY]US2003110355 (FUJIMOTO KAZUHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,6,9,12,14-16 * figures 7,8,12 * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0088] * [Y] 2,4,5,7,8,10,11,13; | [Y]WO03075161 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 2,4,5,7,8,10,11,13 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2003229757 (HOSOYA MUTSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0114] *; | EP1484685 [ ] (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] ** paragraph [0025] * | Examination | US6675268 | by applicant | US2003110355 | WO03075161 |