EP1522268 - Expandable orthopedic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Expanding Orthopedics, Inc. Souther Industrial Park 2 Alon HaTavor Street PO Box 3158 38900 Caesarea / IL | [2008/40] |
Former [2005/15] | For all designated states Levy, Mark 12/12 Hasajlav Street 43554 Raanana / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/15] | Representative(s) | Lecomte, Didier Lecomte & Partners Sàrl P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Lecomte, Didier Lecomte & Partners Sàrl B.P. 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/15] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04030532.8 | 19.10.2000 | [2005/15] | Priority number, date | US19990426563 | 22.10.1999 Original published format: US 426563 | [2005/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1522268 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1522268 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/72 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
A61B17/7275 (EP,US);
A61B17/7266 (EP,US);
A61B17/744 (EP,US);
A61B17/746 (EP,US);
A61B17/921 (EP,US);
A61B17/68 (EP,US);
A61B17/725 (EP,US);
A61B17/7291 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00539 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/15] | Title | German: | Expandierbare orthopädische Anordnung | [2005/15] | English: | Expandable orthopedic device | [2005/15] | French: | Dispositif orthopédique extensible | [2005/15] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 22.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00969786.3 / EP1225838 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.12.2008 | BE | 24.12.2008 | CY | 24.12.2008 | DK | 24.12.2008 | FI | 24.12.2008 | IT | 24.12.2008 | SE | 24.03.2009 | GR | 25.03.2009 | ES | 04.04.2009 | PT | 25.05.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IT | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 24.12.2008 | |
BE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
PT | 25.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 24.12.2008 | |
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 24.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3779239 (MULLER J, et al) [X] 1-14 * column 4, line 13 - line 26; figure . * * column 4, line 46 - line 54 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 10 * [Y] 15,16; | [X]DE3922044 (RICHTER TURTUR MATTHIAS DR [DE]) [X] 1,6-9,12,13 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 40; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]GB2268068 (DAVIES JOHN BRUCE CLAYFIELD [GB]) [A] 1,6,9* abstract *; | [A]US5437674 (WORCEL ALEXANDRE [FR], et al) [A] 1,6,9 * column 3, line 26 - line 65; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]DE19612276 (MEDICAD ENGINEERING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,9 * column 5, line 8 - column 7, line 1; figures 1-3 * [A] 12,13; | [YA]EP0882431 (BARTOLOMEI CLAUDIO DI [IT], et al) [Y] 15,16 * column 2, line 24 - line 38 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 4; figures 1,7 * [A] 1 |