EP1549004 - Scheduling of downlink packets in a mobile network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishii, Hiroyuki c/o Int. Prop.Dept. NTT DoCoMo, Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Takehiro c/o Int.Prp.Dept.NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hanaki, Akihito c/o Int.Prp.Dept.NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Imamura, Yoshimasa c/o Int.Prp.Dept.NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Tanaka, Shinya c/o Int. Prop. Dept. NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04030784.5 | 24.12.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | JP20030428372 | 24.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003428372 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1549004 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1549004 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | [2007/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04W72/535 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04W72/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/22] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ablauffolgesteuerung von abwärtsgerichteten Packeten in einem Mobilfunknetz | [2005/26] | English: | Scheduling of downlink packets in a mobile network | [2005/26] | French: | Ordonancement des paquets dans le sens descendant dans un réseau mobile | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 01.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02085054 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [1011] - paragraph [1033] * * figures 1-4 *; | [XY]WO02085061 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,11 * paragraph [1058] - paragraph [1064] * * paragraph [1070] - paragraph [1090] * [Y] 10; | [XY]US2003104817 (DAMNJANOVIC ALEKSANDAR [US]) [X] 1,11 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0081] * [Y] 6-9; | [A]US2003193906 (ANDREWS DANIEL MATTHEW [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0058] ** figures 1-3 *; | [XY] - KAPSEOK CHANG ET AL, "QoS-based adaptive scheduling for a mixed service in HDR system", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 2002. THE 13TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SEPT. 15-18, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020915), vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-7589-0, pages 1914 - 1918, XP010611598 [X] 1-4,11 * the whole document * [Y] 5-10 |