Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1549004
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
10.10.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
03.07.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.01.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.08.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
25.04.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
19.04.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2008 |
First examination report |
|
02.04.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.02.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.02.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2007 |
Publication of search report |
published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] |
05.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.05.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |
13.05.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |