Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7623489 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2009 | B2 | US2005163111 | 28.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003428372 | 24.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4272048B | Global Dossier | 03.06.2009 | B2 | JP2005191745 | 14.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003428372 | 24.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1549004 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2007 | A3 | EP1549004 | 29.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003428372 | 24.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100463441C | 18.02.2009 | C | CN1638360 | 13.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003428372 | 24.12.2003 |