EP1550390 - Device for holding table cloths [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prunbauer, Kurt Ossarn am Berg 6 3130 Herzogenburg / AT | For all designated states Prunbauer, Michael Ossarn am Berg 6 3130 Herzogenburg / AT | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Puchberger, Peter Puchberger, Berger & Partner Reichsratsstrasse 13 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Puchberger, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Puchberger, Berger & Partner Reichsratsstrasse 13 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04030793.6 | 27.12.2004 | [2005/27] | Priority number, date | AT20030002095 | 29.12.2003 Original published format: AT 20952003 | [2005/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1550390 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1550390 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47G21/16 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
A47G21/167 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Halten von Tischtüchern | [2005/27] | English: | Device for holding table cloths | [2005/27] | French: | Dispositif pour tenir des nappes de table | [2005/27] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/08] | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.03.2008 | CZ | 05.03.2008 | DK | 05.03.2008 | EE | 05.03.2008 | FI | 05.03.2008 | IE | 05.03.2008 | IT | 05.03.2008 | LT | 05.03.2008 | NL | 05.03.2008 | PL | 05.03.2008 | RO | 05.03.2008 | SI | 05.03.2008 | SK | 05.03.2008 | TR | 05.03.2008 | BG | 05.06.2008 | SE | 05.06.2008 | GR | 06.06.2008 | ES | 16.06.2008 | IS | 05.07.2008 | PT | 05.08.2008 | HU | 06.09.2008 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
TR | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
HU | 06.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
HU | 06.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CY | 05.03.2008 | |
CZ | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
BG | 05.06.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
EE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
LT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
IS | 05.07.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 05.03.2008 | |
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
RO | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SK | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SI | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
PL | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 05.03.2008 | |
ES | 16.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB190926249 (HUNNINGS THOMAS) [A] 1; | [A]DE19923895 (NESE YURDAKUL [DE]) [A] 1; | [X]EP1342430 (RIZZO SAVERIO [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,8,9 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1,2 *; | [E]DE202004012029U (BREMER MARITA [DE]) [E] 1* the whole document * |