EP1554968 - Cleaning tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Property Management Group N.V. Emancipatie Boulevard 31 Curaçao / AN | [2005/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunne, Brendan Apeldoornseweg 154 6814 BP Arnhem / NL | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Tabeling, Marcella M.J., et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | Tabeling, Marcella M.J., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 04075009.3 | 09.01.2004 | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1554968 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/22 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
A47L13/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/15] |
Former [2005/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reinigungsgerät | [2005/29] | English: | Cleaning tool | [2005/29] | French: | Outil de nettoyage | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/40] | 17.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.02.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.02.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.02.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6010267 (VITO JOHN [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 35; figure 1 *; | [X]US6659670 (BLOUSE GARY [US]) [X] 1-12* column 1, line 13 - column 3, line 30; figures 1-3 * |