EP1439589 - Microcavity oled devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tyan, Yuan-Sheng Eastman Kodak Company PLS 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Shore, Joel D. Eastman Kodak Company PLS 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Farruggia, Giuseppe Eastman Kodak Company PLS 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Raychaudhuri, Pranab K. Eastman Kodak Company PLS 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | 05 /
Madathil, Joseph K. Eastman Kodak Company PLS 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04075035.8 | 07.01.2004 | [2004/30] | Priority number, date | US20030346424 | 17.01.2003 Original published format: US 346424 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1439589 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1439589 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/20 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
H10K50/852 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/856 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/01] |
Former [2004/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OLED mit Mikroresonator | [2004/30] | English: | Microcavity oled devices | [2004/30] | French: | OLED à microcavité | [2004/30] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/28] | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.12.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.12.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1154676 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [XA]US2002190639 (YAMADA JIRO [JP], et al); | [E]EP1422977 (SONY CORP [JP]); |