EP1555076 - Quick change mandrel assembly and adapter for a hole saw and hole saw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.V. Custom style B.V. Postduivenveld 25 2727DC Zoetermeer / NL | [2005/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gillissen, Hubert Postduivenveld 25 2727 DC Zoetermeer / NL | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Klavers, Cornelis Octrooibureau Klavers B.V. P.O. Box 1642 1300 BP Almere / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Klavers, Cornelis Octrooibureau Klavers B.V. P.O. Box 1642 NL-1314 AJ Almere / NL | ||
Former [2005/29] | Verhees, Godefridus Josephus Maria Brabants Octrooibureau, De Pinckart 54 5674 CC Nuenen / NL | Application number, filing date | 04075048.1 | 17.01.2004 | [2005/29] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1555076 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/04 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
B23B51/0473 (EP,US);
B23B51/0426 (EP,US);
B23B51/0453 (EP,US);
Y10T408/51 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Title | German: | Schnellspanndorneinheit und Adapter für eine Lochsäge und Lochsäge | [2005/29] | English: | Quick change mandrel assembly and adapter for a hole saw and hole saw | [2005/29] | French: | Mandrin à serrage rapide et adapteur pour scie à trous et scie à trous | [2005/29] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 01.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/10] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001062783 ; | [XA]US5076741 (LITTLEHORN JAMES M [US]) [X] 14-16 * column 2, line 25 - line 56 * * figure - * [A] 1,10,17; | [XA]US5082403 (SUTTON JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1,8-11 * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 57 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 17; | [X]US5226762 (ECKER ROBERT J [US]) [X] 14-16 * column 4, line 56 - line 61 * * figure 1 *; | [DA]US2001001276 (CHAO WALLEY [TW]) [DA] 1,10,17 * the whole document *; | [DA]US2002037201 (DESPRES ROGER J [US]) [DA] 1,10,17* the whole document *; | [X]WO03024677 (KEIGHTLEY KYM JOHN [AU]) [X] 14-16 * page 6, line 9 - line 31 * * page 8, line 9 - line 13 * * figures 1,4,9 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP2001062783 A 20010313 (HOUSE BM:KK) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-4,8 * |