EP1557975 - Method for implementing an Internet Protocol (IP) charging and rating middleware platform and gateway system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Redknee Inc. 2560 Matheson Boulevard East Suite 500 Mississauga, ON L4W 4Y9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states Redknee Inc. 2560 Matheson Boulevard East Suite 500 Mississauga ON L4W 4Y9 / CA | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Redknee (Ireland) Ltd. 6 Sandyford Business Centre, Blackthorn Road, Sandyford Dublin 18 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramakrishnan, Karthik 2129 Marl Lane Burlington, Ontario L7M 3P7 / CA | 02 /
Collett, Ian Ench-Kastne str. 7 80796 München / DE | 03 /
Rahim, Rubens 47 Bethune Way Markhan, ON L3S 4A5 / CA | [2005/44] |
Former [2005/30] | 01 /
Ramakrishnan, Karthik 2129 Marl Lane Burlington, Ontario L7M 3P7 / CA | ||
02 /
Collett, Ian Ench-Kastne str. 7 80796 München / DE | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2012/39] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/43] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04075195.0 | 22.01.2004 | [2005/30] | Priority number, date | US20030348972 | 23.01.2003 Original published format: US 348972 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1557975 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1557975 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/14, H04M15/00 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Implementierung einer Vergebührungs- und Einstufungs-Middleware-Plattform für Internet Protokoll und ein Gatewaysystem | [2005/30] | English: | Method for implementing an Internet Protocol (IP) charging and rating middleware platform and gateway system | [2005/30] | French: | Procédé pour l'implémentation d'une plateforme intergicielle pour la taxation et la facturation du Protocole Internet et d'un système passerelle | [2005/30] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 21.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/52] | Divisional application(s) | EP10185387.7 / EP2264942 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 17.10.2012 | ID: | 02 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 17.06.2013 | [2013/31] |
Former [2012/48] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 17.10.2012 | ||
[2013/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003083990 (BERG ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0022] ** paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0055]; figure 2 *; | [X] - FONKNECHTEN D., GHRIBI B., BESSET C., AIDAN B., "SERVICE AWARE INTELLIGENT GGSN", ALCATEL TELECOMMUNICATIONS REVIEW, VÉLIZY FRANCE, (20031001), no. Q4 2003, pages 1 - 10, XP002294181 [X] 1-9 * page 3, column 1, line 33 - page 4, column 1, line 3; figure 2 * * page 7, column 2, line 1 - page 9, column 1, line 8; figure 6 * |