21.11.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
20.08.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.05.2014 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.01.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.06.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
28.06.2013 |
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
22.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2012 |
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
24.08.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] |
28.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.05.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.12.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.10.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
06.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.06.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
10.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.09.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.06.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.04.2006 |
Correction of patent application |
published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |
07.04.2006 |
Change - priority |
published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |
24.03.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] |
03.03.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] |
08.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.12.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.01.2006 [2006/04] |
16.09.2005 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] |
09.09.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] |
10.06.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.07.2005 [2005/30] |
25.06.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC 1973: fee payment |
|
25.06.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC 1973: fee payment |
|
04.05.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.05.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|