EP1437688 - Raycasting system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Algotec Systems Ltd. P.O. Box 2408, Industrial Zone Raanana 43000 / IL | [2007/48] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Algotec Systems Ltd. P.O. Box 2408, Industrial Zone Raanana 43000 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akerman, Schmuel Talpiot Street 28 52533 Ramat Gan / IL | 02 /
Miller, Gad 42940 Kfar Yedidia / IL | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04075574.6 | 18.02.1999 | [2004/29] | Priority number, date | US19980075519 | 23.02.1998 Original published format: US 75519 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1437688 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1437688 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/40 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
G06T15/06 (EP);
G06T15/40 (EP);
G06T15/405 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2004/29] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Strahlverfolgung | [2004/29] | English: | Raycasting system and method | [2004/29] | French: | Système et méthode de lancer de rayons | [2004/29] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 18.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99906420.7 / EP1058914 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 28.02.2008 | [2008/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - DILLENSEGER J L ET AL, "An Integrated Multi-purpose Ray Tracing Framework For The Visualization Of Medical Images", ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY, 1991. VOL.13: 1991., PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ORLANDO, FL, USA 31 OCT.-3 NOV. 1991, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19911031), ISBN 0-7803-0216-8, pages 1125 - 1126, XP010101788 [A] 1-3 * page 1126, column L, paragraph II.2 - paragraph III * |