EP1569069 - Keyboard arrangement for handheld electronic devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Griffin, Jason Tyler 522 Cairncroft Place Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2J5 / CA | 02 /
Tyneski, Frank Matthew 235 Cameron Street North Waterloo, Ontario N2H 3B3 / CA | [2008/19] |
Former [2005/35] | 01 /
Griffin, Jason Tyler 522 Cairncroft Place Waterloo, Ontario N2T 2J5 / CA | ||
02 /
Tyneski, Frank Mathew 235 Cameron Street North Waterloo, Ontario N2H 3B3 / CA | Representative(s) | Rickard, David John Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Rickard, David John Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2005/35] | Rickard, David John IPULSE, 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04075586.0 | 26.02.2004 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1569069 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1569069 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/02, G06F1/16, G06F3/023 | [2005/35] | CPC: |
G06F3/0216 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/35] | Extension states | AL | 26.03.2004 | LT | 26.03.2004 | LV | 26.03.2004 | MK | 26.03.2004 | Title | German: | Tastaturanordnung für ein tragbares elektronisches Gerät | [2005/35] | English: | Keyboard arrangement for handheld electronic devices | [2005/35] | French: | Disposition de clavier pour un appareil électronique portatif | [2005/35] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 11.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.10.2006 | BE | 11.10.2006 | CH | 11.10.2006 | CY | 11.10.2006 | CZ | 11.10.2006 | EE | 11.10.2006 | FI | 11.10.2006 | IT | 11.10.2006 | LI | 11.10.2006 | NL | 11.10.2006 | RO | 11.10.2006 | SI | 11.10.2006 | SK | 11.10.2006 | TR | 11.10.2006 | BG | 11.01.2007 | DK | 11.01.2007 | SE | 11.01.2007 | GR | 12.01.2007 | ES | 22.01.2007 | IE | 26.02.2007 | LU | 26.02.2007 | MC | 28.02.2007 | PT | 19.03.2007 | HU | 12.04.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CY | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IE | 26.02.2007 | ||
LU | 26.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
EE | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IE | 26.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
GR | 12.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IE | 26.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
IE | 26.02.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
SK | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
IT | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
RO | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
DK | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
BE | 11.10.2006 | ||
CH | 11.10.2006 | ||
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
LI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 11.10.2006 | |
FI | 11.10.2006 | ||
NL | 11.10.2006 | ||
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
BG | 11.01.2007 | ||
SE | 11.01.2007 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 11.10.2006 | |
SI | 11.10.2006 | ||
ES | 22.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/15] | SI | 11.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02075514 (JOHN MELANIE [DE]) [Y] 1-20 * figures 1,2,7-10 * * page 1, paragraph L * * page 2, paragraphs 2,4 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 8 *; | [XY]US2003063070 (KANG BENG HONG ALEX [SG]) [XY] 1,2,4-7,12-17,20 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] - [0022]; claims 1-15 * [Y] 3,11,19; | [Y]WO03056784 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 8-10,18* paragraph [0050] *; | [XY]US6628511 (ENGSTROM ERIC [US]) [XY] 1,2,4-7,12-17,20 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 24; figures 2-4 * * column 4, lines 40-59 * * column 5, lines 18-43 * [Y] 3,11,19 |