EP1457909 - Method of facilitating an enterprise change [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2005/51] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states SAP AG Neurottstrasse 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwerin-Wenzel, Sven Max Planck Strasse 10 69234 Dielheim / DE | 02 /
Wood, Eric 573 Menlo Oaks Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 03 /
Kol, Nir 1626 Bittern Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 04 /
Moore, Dennis B 3410 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/38] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04075838.5 | 15.03.2004 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | US20030455087P | 14.03.2003 Original published format: US 455087 P | US20040769472 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: US 769472 | US20040768402 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: US 768402 | US20040768967 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: US 768967 | US20040769297 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: US 769297 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1457909 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1457909 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP);
G06Q40/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ermöglichung eines Unternehmenswechsels | [2004/38] | English: | Method of facilitating an enterprise change | [2004/38] | French: | Prodédé pour faciliter un changement d'entreprise | [2004/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 24.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/43] | 19.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/43] | 07.06.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6067477 (WEWALAARACHCHI BANDU J [SG], et al) [X] 1-30 * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 26; figure 3 *; | [X]US2003023471 (KETTLER EDWARD W [US], et al) [X] 1-30* paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0027] - [0029]; figures 2,3; claims 1,16 * |