EP1471300 - Device suitable for supporting a component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vogel's Holding B.V. Hondsruglaan 93 5628 DB Eindhoven / NL | [2004/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Kuijk, Ewald Bleyslaan 38 5622 GN Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
van Groesen, Wilhelmus Maria Hogendriesstraat 19 5017 GA Tilburg / NL | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau De Kennispoort, John F. Kennedylaan 2 5612 AB Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/44] | Veldman-Dijkers, Cornelia G.C., Ir., et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04075928.4 | 24.03.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | NL20031023051 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: NL 1023051 | [2004/44] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1471300 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1471300 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | [2005/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471300 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/10, F16M11/12, F16M11/04 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
F16M13/02 (EP);
F16M11/041 (EP);
F16M11/10 (EP);
F16M11/2014 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/44] | F16M11/10, F16M11/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Tragen von einem Element | [2004/44] | English: | Device suitable for supporting a component | [2004/44] | French: | Dispositif pour le support d'un élément | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.07.2009 | BE | 01.07.2009 | CY | 01.07.2009 | CZ | 01.07.2009 | DK | 01.07.2009 | EE | 01.07.2009 | FI | 01.07.2009 | IT | 01.07.2009 | PL | 01.07.2009 | RO | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | SI | 01.07.2009 | SK | 01.07.2009 | TR | 01.07.2009 | BG | 01.10.2009 | GR | 02.10.2009 | ES | 12.10.2009 | PT | 02.11.2009 | HU | 02.01.2010 | GB | 24.03.2010 | IE | 24.03.2010 | LU | 24.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | FR | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CY | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
HU | 02.01.2010 | ||
GB | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LU | 24.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CY | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
HU | 02.01.2010 | ||
GB | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CY | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
GB | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | SI | 01.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4516751 (WESTBROOK CHARLES [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 14; figure 1 * [A] 6; | [X]EP0202446 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]US5833183 (CHANG CHIH-CHING [TW]); | [XA]DE29905420U (SCHWERING [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * page 8, line 15 - page 10, line 19; figures 1,2 * [A] 6; | [X]US6047939 (KIM KYOUNG BOK [KR]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 19; figures 4,5 *; | [XA]EP1139003 (BOSSON PETER THOMAS [GB]) [X] 1,5-7,9 * column 4, line 1 - line 20 * * column 5, line 3 - line 35; figures 1-3,9A,9B,11 * [A] 8; | [A]US6367756 (WANG JAMES [TW]) [A] 6 * column 3, line 26 - line 34; figure 6 * | by applicant | US5833183 |