EP1440619 - Fat based food products comprising sterols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
DE
DK
ES
FR
IT
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For:BE
DE
DK
ES
FR
IT
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2004/31] | For:BE
DE
DK
ES
FR
IT
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Amerongen, Marnix P Iglo Mora Groep B.V, Reggeweg 15 7447 AN Hellendoorn / NL | 02 /
Lievense, Lourus Cornelis Unilever Bestfoods, Nassaukade 3 3071 JL Rotterdam / NL | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Joppe, Hermina Laura Petronella Unilever Patent Group P.O. Box 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | [2006/37] |
Former [2005/32] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [2004/31] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Department Postbus 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 04075960.7 | 31.07.1998 | [2004/31] | Priority number, date | EP19970202595 | 22.08.1997 Original published format: EP 97202595 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1440619 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1440619 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23D9/00, A23D7/00, A23L1/24, A23G9/42 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/231 (EP);
A23D7/0056 (EP);
A23D7/013 (EP);
A23D7/015 (EP);
A23D9/007 (EP);
A23D9/013 (EP);
A23G3/0205 (EP);
A23G3/346 (EP);
A23G9/52 (EP);
A23L27/60 (EP);
A23L33/11 (EP);
A23L33/12 (EP);
A61K31/232 (EP);
A61K31/56 (EP);
A61K31/57 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23G3/346, A23G2200/00 (EP);
A23G3/346, A23G2200/08 (EP);
A61K31/231, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/232, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2004/31] | A23D9/00, A23D7/00, A23L1/24, A23G9/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, SE [2004/31] | Title | German: | Fettenthaltende Nahrungsmittelprodukte mit Sterolen | [2004/31] | English: | Fat based food products comprising sterols | [2004/31] | French: | Produits alimentaires à base de graisses et contenant des stérols | [2004/31] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 03.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2005 | Observations by third parties | 20.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98202587.6 / EP0898896 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.07.2007
03.08.2007
ADMISSIBLE McNeil Nutritionals, LLC 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 02
25.07.2007
03.08.2007
ADMISSIBLE RAISIO BENECOL LTD PO BOX 101 Raisionkaari 55 21201 Raisio / FI Opponent's representative Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.07.2007
03.08.2007
ADMISSIBLE McNeil Nutritionals, LLC 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
02
25.07.2007
03.08.2007
ADMISSIBLE RAISIO BENECOL LTD PO BOX 101 Raisionkaari 55 21201 Raisio / FI Opponent's representative Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
Former [2007/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.07.2007
03.08.2007
ADMISSIBLE McNeil Nutritionals, LLC 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US Opponent's representative Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
02
25.07.2007
03.08.2007
ADMISSIBLE RAISIO BENECOL LTD PO BOX 101 Raisionkaari 55 21201 Raisio / FI Opponent's representative Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square LONDON WC1A 2RA / GB | 06.09.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 02.02.2009 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.11.2006 | IT | 02.11.2006 | NL | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.02.2007 | ES | 13.02.2007 | BE | 31.07.2007 | DK | 31.07.2007 | GB | 31.07.2007 | IE | 31.07.2007 | DE | 01.02.2008 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | IT | 02.11.2006 | |
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
FR | 15.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
DK | 31.07.2007 | ||
GB | 31.07.2007 | ||
IE | 31.07.2007 | ||
DE | 01.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | IT | 02.11.2006 | |
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
FR | 15.06.2007 | ||
BE | 31.07.2007 | ||
DK | 31.07.2007 | ||
GB | 31.07.2007 | ||
DE | 01.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | IT | 02.11.2006 | |
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
FR | 15.06.2007 | ||
DK | 31.07.2007 | ||
GB | 31.07.2007 | ||
DE | 01.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | IT | 02.11.2006 | |
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
FR | 15.06.2007 | ||
GB | 31.07.2007 | ||
DE | 01.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | IT | 02.11.2006 | |
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
FR | 15.06.2007 | ||
DE | 01.02.2008 | ||
Former [2007/43] | IT | 02.11.2006 | |
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | NL | 02.11.2006 | |
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 02.11.2006 | |
ES | 13.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3751569 (ERICKSON B) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1405346 (HARBURGER OELWERKE BRINCKMAN M) [A] 1-10 * examples 1,2 * * claims 1-11 *; | [DA]WO9219640 (RAISION MARGARIINI OY [FI]) [DA] 1* claims 1-9 *; | [DA]WO9638047 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-10 * page 9, line 2 - line 15 * * claims 1-10 *; | [PX]WO9742830 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1-10 * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 3 * * claims 1-6,9,10,12,13 *; | [PX]WO9801126 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1-10 * page 10, line 1 - line 4 * * claims 1,12,15-18 *; | [PA]WO9806405 (RAISION TEHTAAT OY AB [FI], et al) [PA] 1-10 * claims 1-10 *; | [PA]WO9819556 (RAISIO YHTYMAE OYJ [FI], et al) [PA] 1-10 * claims 1-27 *; | [PA]WO9828990 (PHARMACONSULT OY [FI], et al) [PA] 1,9 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 13 * * claim 1 * | other | - MIETTINEN T.A. ET AL., "REDUCTION OF SERUM CHOLESTEROL WITH SITOSTANOL-ESTER MARGARINE IN A MILDLY HYPERCHOLESTEROLEMIC POPULATION", NEW ENGLAND J MED, (1995), vol. 333, no. 20, pages 1308 - 1312, XP002920145 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJM199511163332002 |