EP1467247 - High contrast indicator element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Wen-Li A., c/o Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Bourdelais, Robert P., c/o Eastman Kodak Co. 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Brickey, Cheryl J., c/o Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Castle, Richard A., c/o Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 05 /
Smith, Thomas M., c/o Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2004/42] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2004/42] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited, Patents Department (W92-3A), Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04076014.2 | 29.03.2004 | [2004/42] | Priority number, date | US20030409500 | 08.04.2003 Original published format: US 409500 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1467247 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1467247 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03C1/77, G03C1/795 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
G03C1/34 (EP,US);
G03C1/047 (EP,US);
G03C1/77 (EP,US);
G03C1/795 (EP,US);
G03C2001/7425 (EP);
G03C2200/16 (EP);
| C-Set: |
G03C1/77, G03C2200/35, G03C2200/47, G03C2200/16, G03C2001/7425 (EP,US);
G03C1/795, G03C2200/16, G03C2001/7425 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE [2005/35] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hochkontrastreiches Indikatorelement | [2004/42] | English: | High contrast indicator element | [2004/42] | French: | Elément indicateur à haut contraste | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 09.06.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FR, GB | 17.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/28] | 23.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/28] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.07.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS61210346 ; | [X]US5053322 (SHIBA KEISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 6 - line 18 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 5 * * column 4, line 23 - line 32 * * column 7, line 23 - line 29 * * column 40, line 31 - line 39 * * example 1, sample 2 * * example 3, sample 102 * * example 4, sample 121 * * claims 1,2 * * figure 5A *; | [DX]US6291150 (CAMP ALPHONSE D [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,4,7 * column 1, line 6 - line 9 * * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 14 * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 4 * * examples 2,3 * * claims 1,2,4-7,13-16,19,20,25,26,28-33 * * claims 38,40,41,43,45-47,53-55,57,58 *; | [X]WO0221208 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * page 1, line 6 - line 7 * * page 4, line 1 - line 15 * * page 5, line 18 - line 29 * * page 6, line 10 - line 19 * * page 7, line 1 - line 10 * * page 9, line 1 - line 5 * * page 17, line 5 - page 18, line 2 * * page 19, line 1 - line 5 * * example - * * claims 1,2,4,5,16-18,20,23,24,31,32,34,43 ** figure 7 *; | [X]US6437324 (BRAUN PAUL WILHELM [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * column 1, line 6 - line 12 * * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 8 * * column 2, line 35 - line 40 * * column 3, line 23 - line 27 * * claims 1-3,5-7 * * figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870205), vol. 011, no. 040, Database accession no. (P - 544), & JP61210346 A 19860918 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |