19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
28.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
29.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
08.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
08.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
04.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
17.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
12.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
17.09.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] |
27.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
06.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
30.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
02.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
25.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] |
21.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
14.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
07.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] |
30.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
09.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
09.10.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] |
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.07.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2008 |
First examination report |
|
08.03.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.02.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
18.01.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
08.06.2007 |
Publication of search report |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
23.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] |