Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1477728 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2009 | B1 | EP1477728 | 11.07.2007 | A3 | EP1477728 | 17.11.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20030974 | 16.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE448441T | 15.11.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20030974 | 16.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004023994D1 | 24.12.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20030974 | 16.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITMI20030974 | 17.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20030974 | 16.05.2003 |