EP1491450 - Separation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Logitec Plus B.V. Cypresbaan 31b 2908 LT Capelle a/d IJssel / NL | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Baat, Marius Cornelis Perenhof 1 2661 LK Bergschenhoek / NL | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Ferguson, Alexander Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Ferguson, Alexander Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade, P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04076844.2 | 24.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | NL20031023756 | 26.06.2003 Original published format: NL 1023756 | [2005/01] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1491450 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
B65B69/0033 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/38] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Trennungsvorrichtung | [2005/01] | English: | Separation device | [2005/01] | French: | Dispositif de séparation | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/12] | 24.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.08.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1575079 (CARLSEN AB H) [X] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 78 - page 2, column 2, line 120 *; | [A]GB2106774 (CLARKE BROTHERS) [A] 1; | [A]US5870882 (LOWE BYRON L [US])[A] 1 |