EP1609729 - Combination of at least two cans [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Impress Group B.V. Zutphenseweg 51051 7418 AH Deventer / NL | [2005/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boogert, Robert Marcel Erve Jenneboer 17 7623 JG Borne / NL | 02 /
Blaauw, Hendrikus Jozephus Anthonius Bloemberg 12 7924 PW Veeningen / NL | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2005/52] | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob, et al Arnold & Siedsma Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04076849.1 | 24.06.2004 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1609729 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D21/02, B65D51/20 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
B65D21/0227 (EP);
B65D25/36 (EP);
B65D43/169 (EP);
B65D51/20 (EP);
B65D51/245 (EP);
B65D51/247 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Title | German: | Kombination aus zumindest zwei Dosen | [2005/52] | English: | Combination of at least two cans | [2005/52] | French: | Combinaison comprenant au moins deux boîtes | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 08.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/14] | 23.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3343746 (SHIFFMAN SEYMOUR B) [Y] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4293079 (LYTLE THOMAS G) [Y] 2-4 * abstract *; | [Y]US4930636 (MEADOWS MARCIA A [US]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 4, line 5 - column 4, line 9 *; | [Y]US4940141 (PHILPOT TERRY [CA]) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US5273176 (DIAZ EUSEBIO M [US]) [Y] 2-4 * column 3, paragraph L - column 4, paragraph 1; figure 6 *; | [A]US5273177 (CAMPBELL PHILLIP J [US]) [A] 4* abstract *; | [Y]GB2303114 (ROBINSON JONATHAN D [GB]) [Y] 1 * page 4, paragraph 1; figures 4,5 * |