EP1614619 - Impact absorbing part of a ship [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Modus Marine Safety BV i.o. Zuidersluis weg 84 8243 RC Lelystad / NL | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pol, J.M.A. Jol 30-05 8243 HA Lelystad / NL | 02 /
Cossee, J.P. Zuidersluisweg 84 8243 RC Lelystad / NL | [2006/02] | Application number, filing date | 04076984.6 | 09.07.2004 | [2006/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1614619 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B63B43/18, B63H25/38 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
B63B43/18 (EP);
B63H25/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/37] |
Former [2006/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schiffsstossdämpfungseinheit | [2006/02] | English: | Impact absorbing part of a ship | [2006/02] | French: | Partie d'un bateau pour l'absorption des chocs | [2006/02] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 29.12.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 12.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/13] | 06.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB107445 (BELTRAMI LUIGI [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3722259 (KOEPPL J BRUNO DR [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19604966 (MISBACH MARCO [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * figure -; claims 1-3 *; | [X]WO0030930 (BAE SEMA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10* abstract *; | [XY]FR2822797 (PHILIPPE BARON D [FR]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * page 2, line 33 - page 5, line 28; figure - * [Y] 4,9,10; | [XY]US6591772 (LARSEN PER KRISTIAN [NO], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * abstract * [Y] 6,9,10; | [XY]FR2834686 (VIRONNEAU PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,8 * abstract * [Y] 4,6,9,10; | [EX]EP1516812 (ABEKING & RASMUSSEN SCHIFFS UN [DE]) [EX] 1,2,4,5,9 * abstract * |