EP1467059 - Method and apparatus for completing wells with lateral branches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 819052 Dallas Texas 75381-9052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. P.O. Box 819052 Dallas, Texas 75381-9052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Longbottom, James R. P.O. Box 1115 Magnolia, Texas 77353 / US | 02 /
van Petegam, Ronald Plot 212 Musa Yr' Adua Str. Apt. 8 Victoria Island Lagos / NI | 03 /
Turner, William H. Balgownie, Meikle Wartle Inverurie Aberdeenshire AB515AA / GB | [2005/10] |
Former [2004/42] | 01 /
Longbottom, James R. P.O. Box 1115 Magnolia, Texas 77353 / US | ||
02 /
van Petegam, Ronald Snehvitveien 58 4300 Sandnes / NO | |||
03 /
Turner, William H. Balgownie, Meikle Wartle Inverurie Aberdeenshire AB515AA / GB | Representative(s) | Curtis, Philip Anthony, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Curtis, Philip Anthony, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 04077012.5 | 12.02.1998 | [2004/42] | Priority number, date | US19970799333 | 13.02.1997 Original published format: US 799333 | [2004/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1467059 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Classification | IPC: | E21B29/06, E21B33/10, E21B23/00, E21B7/06 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
E21B7/061 (EP,US);
E21B23/12 (EP,US);
E21B29/06 (EP,US);
E21B41/0042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Komplettieren von Mehrfach-Bohrungen | [2004/42] | English: | Method and apparatus for completing wells with lateral branches | [2004/42] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'équipement des puits ramifiés | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98301029.9 / EP0859124 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |