EP1618876 - Use of sphingolipids for prevention and treatment of atherosclerosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast-Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nieuwenhuizen, Willem Ferdinand Provincialeweg 61A 3981 AM Bunnik / NL | 02 /
Emeis, Josephus Jan Hoogte Kadijk 37C 1018 BE Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
Havekes, Aloysius Maria Lokhorst 9 2402 PP Alphen aan den Rijn / NL | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04077091.9 | 19.07.2004 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1618876 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/133, A61K31/688, A23J7/00, A23L1/30, A61P9/10 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/133 (EP,US);
A61K31/688 (EP,US);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/39] |
Former [2006/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung von Sphingolipiden zur Vorbeugung und Behandlung von Atherosklerose | [2006/04] | English: | Use of sphingolipids for prevention and treatment of atherosclerosis | [2006/04] | French: | Utilisation de sphingolipides pour la prévention et le traitement de l'athérosclérose | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/15] | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS6344842 ; | [XY]KR20010008569 ; | [XY]JP2003137894 ; | [XY]WO9203129 (UNIV DUKE [US]) [X] 1,7,10 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 28 * * page 8, line 14 - line 17 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 8 * * page 12, line 11 - line 15 * * page 13, line 11 - line 20 * [Y] 6,8,9; | [XY]US5190876 (MERRILL JR ALFRED H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,10 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 9 * * claims 1,4,6 * [Y] 6,8,9; | [DXY]WO9941266 (UNIV EMORY [US], et al) [DX] 1-4,7,10 * page 13, line 3 - line 17 * * page 61, line 10 - page 62, line 13 * * page 83, line 10 - line 23 * * claims 3,19,32 * * figure 7; compounds 17A,B * * figure 9; compound 27 * [Y] 6,8,9; | [XY]WO9961581 (DEAN OF RESEARCH AND GRADUATE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,10 * page 36, line 14 - line 21 * [Y] 6,8,9; | [XY]WO0050574 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [X] 1,3,7,10 * page 1, line 12 - line 19 * * page 6, line 13 - page 8, line 12 * * page 16, line 9 - line 14 * * page 19, line 11 - line 18 * * claims 1,2,8-10,28,29,31-33,35-39,41,45-48 * [Y] 6,8,9; | [Y]WO0234062 (MARC BOONE NV [BE], et al) [Y] 6,8,9 * page 4, line 9 - line 18 * * claims 1,7,8 *; | [XY]US2003109044 (LOGAN THOMAS JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,10 * page 1, paragraph 6 * * page 2, paragraphs 23,24,26 * * page 38, paragraph 438 * [Y] 6,8,9; | [XY]US2004047851 (TABAS IRA [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,10 * page 4, paragraph 32 * * page 5, paragraphs 35,36,39 * * page 6, paragraph 51 * * claims 1,3,4,14-16 * [Y] 6,8,9; | [E]WO2004064823 (UNIV ASTON [GB], et al) [E] 1,7,10 * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 5 * * page 6, paragraph 1 * * claims 1,2,10-12 *; | [E]WO2004064820 (TNO [NL], et al) [E] 1-10 * page 1, lines 3-9,18-25 * * page 2, line 4 - line 26 * * page 4, lines 8,9 * * page 5, line 11 - page 7, line 12 * * page 9, line 8 - line 16 * * page 16, lines 1-4 * * page 19, line 14 - line 23 ** claim - *; | [E]EP1452181 (ENZO THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [E] 1,7,10 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 9, paragraphs 35,37 * * column 10, paragraph 43 * * claims 1,7-10,15 *; | [E]WO2004096140 (PENN STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [E] 1,7,10 * page 9, paragraphs 44-46 *; | [A] - M.H. BEERS, R. BERKOW, The Merck Manual of Diagnosis and Therapy, seventeenth edition, WHITEHOUSE STATION, N.J., MERCK RESEARCH LABORATORIES, (1999), XP002311213 [A] * page 1654 - page 1658 * | [XY] - MURATA SHOICHI, HARA KENJI, "O/W/O-type emulsified oil and fat composition", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (19880225), no. 19, Database accession no. 1988-094775, page 4, XP002311214 & JPS6344842 A 19880225 (KAO CORP.) [X] 1,3,7,10 * column A * [Y] 6,8,9 | [XY] - KIM G.W. ET AL., "Angiogenesis promotor containing sphingosine-1-phosphate as active ingredient", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (20020624), no. 20, Database accession no. 2001-473283, page 1, XP002311215 & KR20010008569 A 20010205 (KWON Y G) [X] 1,7,10 * column A * [Y] 6,8,9 | [XY] - TAMAI TADAKAZU ET AL., "Phosphorylated amino alcohol, method of producing the same and use thereof", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (20030514), no. 20, Database accession no. 2003-692298, page 6, XP002311216 & JP2003137894 A 20030514 (NAT. INST. OF ADV. IND. & TECHNOL.; MARUHA CORP.) [X] 1,7,10 * column A * [Y] 6,8,9 |