EP1619753 - Double structure broadband leaky wave antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast-Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neto, Andrea Adama van Scheltemastraat 6 2274 VW Voorburg / NL | 02 /
Van Dijk, Raymond Marcusstraat 16 1091 TK Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
Marliani, Filippo Groenhoevelaan 26 2343 BR Oegstgeest / NL | [2006/04] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04077131.3 | 23.07.2004 | [2006/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1619753 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q13/28 | [2006/04] | CPC: |
H01Q13/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/39] |
Former [2006/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Breitbandige doppel Leckwellenantenne | [2006/04] | English: | Double structure broadband leaky wave antenna | [2006/04] | French: | Antenne large bande à ondes de fuite à structure dédoublée | [2006/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.09.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.09.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.09.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1006611 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 10,11 * abstract * * column 4, paragraphs 22-24 ** column 6, paragraph 40 *; | [A]GB2377556 (ANTENOVA LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 3, lines 16-29 * * page 7, lines 1-19 *; | [A] - NETO A ET AL, "Green's function for an infinite slot printed between two homogeneous dielectrics. I. Magnetic currents", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION IEEE USA, (200307), vol. 51, no. 7, ISSN 0018-926X, pages 1572 - 1581, XP002294554 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1573, column L, lines 41-45 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.2003.813625 |