EP1479520 - Recording head and recording apparatus using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Kanda Nishiki-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-8442 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanuma, Chiaki 1-1 Kanda Nishiki-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8442 / JP | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04077245.1 | 11.09.2002 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | JP20010281137 | 17.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001281137 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1479520 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/155, B41J25/304, B41J2/515 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
B41J25/003 (EP,US);
B41J2/155 (EP,US);
B41J2/515 (EP,US);
B41J25/005 (EP,US);
B41J2202/14 (EP,US);
B41J2202/20 (EP,US);
B41J2202/21 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [2004/48] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungskopf und damit versehenes Aufzeichnungsgerät | [2004/48] | English: | Recording head and recording apparatus using the same | [2004/48] | French: | Tête d'enregistrement et appareil d'enregistrement l'utilisant | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 01.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/41] | 22.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02256270.6 / EP1293344 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06344627 ; | [X]JPH0781049 ; | [A]JP9300664 ; | [X]GB2128439 (MEAD CORP) [X] 1,3,4,8-11 * page 2, line 15 - page 4, line 9; figures 1-3,7 *; | [X]US5237918 (KOBAYASHI HIROTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 3,5,11,12* column 2, line 5 - line 22; figure 4 *; | [X]EP0921008 (FRANCOTYP POSTALIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 3,4,8,11-13 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] *; | [XA]EP0938973 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0069] * * figures 4,6 * [A] 8-10; | [X]WO0164444 (SILVERBROOK RES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 3-5,11-13 * page 6, line 23 - line 30 * * page 10, line 8 - line 27 * * figures 5A,7 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 1995, no. 03, & JP06344627 A 19941220 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 3-5,11-13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 06, & JP07081049 A 19950328 (CANON INC) [X] 3-5,11-13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP9300664 A 19971125 (CANON INC) [A] 8-11 * abstract * |