EP1512925 - Condenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20 Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-875 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-Dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-875 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ki, Soo Hong 2-615 Jeongwoo APT., 911-1 Anyang 3-dong Manan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Sim, Won Chin 1211-1001 Joogong APT Chulsan-dong Gwangmyeng-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Dong, Su Moon 2nd fl. 473-2 Seogyo-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Bergquist, Kjell Gunnar, et al Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bergquist, Kjell Gunnar, et al Albihns AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2008/24] | Bergquist, Kjell Gunnar, et al Albihns AB Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2005/10] | Schlossman, Ulf Albihns Göteborg AB P.O. Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 04077385.5 | 23.08.2004 | [2005/10] | Priority number, date | KR20030061149 | 02.09.2003 Original published format: KR 2003061149 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1512925 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1512925 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F25B39/04 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
F25B39/04 (EP,KR,US);
F25B40/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/36] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verflüssiger | [2005/10] | English: | Condenser | [2005/10] | French: | Condenseur | [2005/10] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 27.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/02] | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0374895 (THERMAL WAERME KAELTE KLIMA [DE]) [X] 1-10 * figures 5,6 *; | [X]US5224358 (YAMANAKA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,2,10 *; | [X]JPH109714 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]FR2754886 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) [X] 1-10 * figure 4 * * page 8, line 12 - line 31 *; | [X]JPH10141884 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1,9 * abstract ** figures 1-6 * |