blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1486495

EP1486495 - Salts of lipoic acid derivatives and their use in treatment of disease [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2004/51]Lipoic acid derivatives and their use in treatment of disease
[2009/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.2010
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.01.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 16.02.2011  [2011/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Research Foundation of State University of New York
P.O. Box 9
Albany, NY 12201 / US
[2009/50]
Former [2004/51]For all designated states
The Research Foundation of State University of New York
P.O. Box 9
Albany, NY 12201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Zachar, Zuzana
23 Dave Lane
Centereach, NY 11720-1006 / US
02 / Bingham, Paul M
23 Dave Lane
Centereach, NY 11720-1006 / US
 [2004/51]
Representative(s)Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date04077618.926.10.1999
[2004/51]
Priority number, dateUS19980105628P26.10.1998         Original published format: US 105628 P
[2004/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1486495
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1486495
Date:09.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2004
ClassificationIPC:C07D339/04, C07C323/52, C07F19/00, A61K31/385, A61P35/00
[2004/51]
CPC:
C07C311/49 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP); C07C323/52 (EP,US);
C07D339/04 (EP,US); C07F19/00 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2004/51]
TitleGerman:Salze von Liponsaürederivaten und deren Verwendung bei der Behandlung von Krankheiten[2009/15]
English:Salts of lipoic acid derivatives and their use in treatment of disease[2009/15]
French:Sels de dérives de l'acide lipoique et leur utilisation dans le traitement des maladies[2009/15]
Former [2004/51]Liponsaürederivate und deren Verwendung bei der Behandlung von Krankheiten
Former [2004/51]Lipoic acid derivatives and their use in treatment of disease
Former [2004/51]Dérives de l'acide lipoique et leur utilisation dans le traitement des maladies
Examination procedure21.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/51]
10.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.09.2008
03.09.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
10.09.2008Date of oral proceedings
10.09.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
08.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2009Fee for grant paid
17.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99956698.7  / EP1124820
Divisional application(s)EP09012728.3  / EP2145883
Opposition(s)10.09.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
21.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.12.2009
CY09.12.2009
DK09.12.2009
FI09.12.2009
NL09.12.2009
SE09.12.2009
GR10.03.2010
PT09.04.2010
[2011/07]
Former [2010/50]AT09.12.2009
CY09.12.2009
FI09.12.2009
NL09.12.2009
SE09.12.2009
GR10.03.2010
PT09.04.2010
Former [2010/35]AT09.12.2009
FI09.12.2009
NL09.12.2009
SE09.12.2009
PT09.04.2010
Former [2010/30]AT09.12.2009
FI09.12.2009
SE09.12.2009
Former [2010/22]FI09.12.2009
SE09.12.2009
Documents cited:SearchJP82123107  [ ] (POLA);
 [X]GB758897  (MERCK & CO INC) [X] 6,12,14,21 * page 1 - page 2 *;
 [X]US2853497  (HOLLY FREDERICK W, et al) [X] 6,12,18 * column 1 - column 10 *;
 [X]DE3629116  (ASTA PHARMA AG [DE]) [X] 6,10-12 * page 1 - page 7 *;
 [X]EP0378204  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 6,13 * page 1 - page 7 *;
 [X]EP0618231  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [X] 6,12,14,21 * page 1 - page 5; claim - *;
 [X]EP0785187  (ASTA MEDICA AG [DE]) [X] 6,12,21 * the whole document *;
 [DA]US5679697  (GARNETT MERRILL [US]) [DA] 1-8,13,21,25-28 * column W *;
 [X]WO9801440  (US HEALTH [US], et al) [X] 6,11,13,14,21 * page 1, lines 5-10 - page 11; claims 1-7 *;
 [PX]EP0947503  (GALDERMA RES & DEV [FR]) [PX] 1-6,12,21,25-28* page 1 - page 16 *;
 [X]  - F.BONOMI ET AL., "SYNTHESIS AND CHARACTERISATION OF METAL DERIVATIVES OF DIHYDROLIPOIC ACID", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1992), vol. 117, no. 78, Database accession no. 39073k, page 889, XP002131664 [X] 6-8 * abstract *
    [ ] - INORG. CHIM. ACTA, ITALY, (1992), vol. 192, no. 2, pages 237 - 42
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1982), vol. 97, no. 20, Database accession no. 168725s, page 368, XP002131665 [X] 6,12 * abstract *
 [X]  - KATAOKA,HIROYUKI, "ANALYSIS OF LIPOIC ACID", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1997), vol. 127, no. 9, Database accession no. 259589e, page 302, XP002131666 [X] 6,9 * abstract *
    [ ] - METHODS ENZYMOL., USA, (1997), vol. 279, no. I, pages 166 - 176 [ ] * RN 196189-89-6 OCTANOIC ACID,6,8-BIS[(ETHOXYCARBONYL)THIO]- *
 [X]  - V.M. GANDHI, "LIPOIC ACID AND DIABETES II.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1986), vol. 104, no. 1, Database accession no. 161793s, page 41, XP002131667 [X] 6,12,14,21 * abstract *
    [ ] - J. BIOSCI., (1985), vol. 9, no. 1-2, pages 117 - 127
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.