EP1494400 - Physical layer device method and system having a media independent interface for connecting to either media access control entries or other physical layer devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/01] | Physical layer device having a media indipendent interface for connecting to either media access control entries or other physical layer devices | ||
[2015/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MC | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/09] |
Former [2014/10] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states LEVEL ONE COMMUNICATIONS, INC 9750 Goethe Road Sacramento, CA 95827 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feuerstraeter, Mark T. 6122 Oakbridge Dr. Granite Bay, CA 95746 / US | 02 /
Sokol, Michael A. 2640 Twin Court Rancho Cordova, CA 95670 / US | 03 /
Vogel, David W. 3567 Stockwood Way El Dorado Hills, CA 95762 / US | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/01] | 01 /
Feuerstraeter, Mark T. 9121 Green Ravine Ln. Fair Oaks, CA 95628 / US | ||
02 /
Sokol, Michael A. 2640 Twin Court Rancho Cordova, CA 95670 / US | |||
03 /
Vogel, David W. 3567 Stockwood Way El Dorado Hills, CA 95762 / US | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/10] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/03] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2005/01] | Sigh, Erik, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 04077732.8 | 08.05.1998 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | US19970854109 | 09.05.1997 Original published format: US 854109 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1494400 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1494400 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494400 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46, H04L12/413, H04L12/40 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
H04L12/40136 (EP,US);
H04L12/40 (EP,US);
H04L12/4013 (EP,US);
H04L12/413 (EP,US);
H04L12/46 (EP,US);
H04L69/32 (US);
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | H04L12/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2016/09] |
Former [2005/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bitübertragungsvorrichtung, Verfahren und System mit medienunabhängiger Schnittstelle zur Verbindung mit entweder einer Mediumzugriffsteuerungseinheit oder anderen Bitübertragungsvorrichtungen | [2015/34] | English: | Physical layer device method and system having a media independent interface for connecting to either media access control entries or other physical layer devices | [2015/33] | French: | Dispositif, procédé et système de couche physique avec interface indépendante du support, destiné à être raccordé soit à des entités de commande d'accès au support, soit à d'autres dispositifs de couche physique | [2015/33] |
Former [2005/01] | Bitübertragungsvorrichtung mit medienunabhängiger Schnittstelle zur Verbindung an entweder einer Mediumzugriffsteuerungseinheit oder anderer Bitübertragungsvorrichtungen | ||
Former [2005/01] | Physical layer device having a media indipendent interface for connecting to either media access control entries or other physical layer devices | ||
Former [2005/01] | Dispositif de couche physique avec interface indépendante du support, destiné à être raccordé soit à des entités de commande d'accès au support, soit à d'autres dispositifs de couche physique | Examination procedure | 28.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 05.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98921061.2 / EP0980612 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980921061) is 13.04.2004 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2016 | BE | 02.03.2016 | CY | 02.03.2016 | DK | 02.03.2016 | ES | 02.03.2016 | FI | 02.03.2016 | IT | 02.03.2016 | MC | 02.03.2016 | NL | 02.03.2016 | SE | 02.03.2016 | IE | 08.05.2016 | LU | 08.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | GR | 03.06.2016 | PT | 04.07.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
IE | 08.05.2016 | ||
LU | 08.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
DK | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 08.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
LU | 08.05.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
BE | 02.03.2016 | ||
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
IT | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
PT | 04.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
NL | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
SE | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.03.2016 | |
ES | 02.03.2016 | ||
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 02.03.2016 | |
FI | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8300238 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 1-19 * page 2, line 1 - line 7 * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO9629801 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-19* page 13, line 17 - page 15, line 17 *; | [DY] - H.W. JOHNSON, Fast Ethernet. Dawn of a new network., USA, PRENTICE HALL PTR, (1996), XP002073888 [DY] 1-19 * page 57 - page 61 * * page 106 - page 114 * |