EP1538484 - EUV illumination system and lithographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ivanov, Vladimir Vitalevitch Garibaldi str 4/2 app 54 Moscow 117313 / RU | 02 /
Banine, Vadim Yevgenyevich Nierslaan 2 5704 NK Helmond / NL | 03 /
Koshelev, Konstantin Nikolaevitch 4 Shkolnaya str. Moscow Region, Troitzk / RU | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2005/23] | Winckels, J.H.F., Mr. Ir., et al Vereenigde, Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04078219.5 | 26.11.2004 | [2005/23] | Priority number, date | US20030727035 | 04.12.2003 Original published format: US 727035 | [2005/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1538484 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
G03F7/70858 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70916 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70091 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/09] |
Former [2005/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EUV-Beleuchtungssystem und Lithographischer Apparat | [2005/23] | English: | EUV illumination system and lithographic apparatus | [2005/23] | French: | Système d'illumination pour l'UV extrême et appareil lithographique | [2005/23] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 09.12.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/48] | 12.07.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.09.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0858249 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-16 * column 11, line 47 - column 12, line 32 * * figure 5 *; | [X]EP1223468 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-16 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032] ** figure 2 *; | [X]US2003190012 (AHMAD IMTIAZ [DE]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0072] * * figure - * |