Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1553493T | 31.01.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP04078334 | 07.12.2004 | DE102004001819 | 07.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1553493 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2007 | B1 | EP1553493 | 13.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001819 | 07.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE372546T | 15.09.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001819 | 07.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100573465C | 23.12.2009 | C | CN1637715 | 13.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004001819 | 07.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004001819 | 04.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001819 | 07.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502004004869D1 | 18.10.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001819 | 07.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1553493T | 25.03.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001819 | 07.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2289428T | 01.02.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001819 | 07.01.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1076523 | 20.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004001819 | 07.01.2004 |