EP1571650 - Device for producing acoustic fields with a defined modal composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Dahlewitz / DE | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Dahlewitz / DE | ||
For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE PLC 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rose, Marco Dr. Am Krönerstolln 63B 09599 Freiberg / DE | 02 /
Holste, Fredi Dr. Gernsheimer Str. 30A 12247 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Arnold, Frank Dr. Fasanenstrasse 6 15838 Am Mellensee OT Saalow / DE | 04 /
Moore, Alastair David 21, Silverburn Drive Oakwood, Derby DE21 2JJ / GB | [2009/01] |
Former [2005/36] | 01 /
Rose, Marco Dr. Am Krönerstolln 63B 09599 Freiberg / DE | ||
02 /
Holste, Fredi Dr. Gernsheimer Str. 30A 12247 Berlin / DE | |||
03 /
Arnold, Frank Dr. Karl-Kunger-Str. 52 12435 Berlin / DE | |||
04 /
Moore, Alastair David 21, Silverburn Drive Oakwood, Derby DE21 2JJ / GB | Representative(s) | Wablat, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Dr. Dr. W. Wablat Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Wablat, Wolfgang Patentanwalt, Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04090083.9 | 03.03.2004 | [2005/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1571650 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1571650 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/178, G10K15/04 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
G10K15/04 (EP,US);
G10K11/178 (EP,US);
G10K2210/3212 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/21] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Erzeugung von Schallfeldern mit bestimmter modaler Zusammensetzung | [2005/36] | English: | Device for producing acoustic fields with a defined modal composition | [2005/36] | French: | Dispositif pour la production de champs sonores avec une composition modale définie | [2005/36] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 08.03.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.06.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.04.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2514129 (HORSLEY CAPERTON B, et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2987033 (DOMENICO COCEANO) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3292727 (OSKAR BSCHORR) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE10103942 (BSCHORR OSKAR [DE]) [A] 1* claim 1 * |